NJ S2185 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S999
Note: Carry Over of previous A2398
Note: Carry Over of previous A2398
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires owners of multiple dwellings with at least nine units to provide certain maintenance services; permits municipalities to require owners of multiple dwellings with six to eight units to provide these services.
Title
Requires owners of multiple dwellings with at least nine units to provide certain maintenance services; permits municipalities to require owners of multiple dwellings with six to eight units to provide these services.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S999 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2398 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3439 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2398 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3439 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2185 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2185_I1.HTM |