NJ S2156 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires prescribers to discuss addiction risk associated with certain drugs prior to issuing prescription to minor patient.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires prescribers to discuss addiction risk associated with certain drugs prior to issuing prescription to minor patient.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3424 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-06AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.8.
2016-12-19AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
2016-12-19AssemblySubstituted for A3424 (1R)
2016-12-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-10-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2016-10-20SenatePassed by the Senate (35-1)
2016-10-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-09-08SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-09-08SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-05-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3424 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2156 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback