NJ A3424 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2156 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires prescribers to discuss addiction risk associated with certain drugs prior to issuing prescription to minor patient.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires prescribers to discuss addiction risk associated with certain drugs prior to issuing prescription to minor patient.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-19AssemblySubstituted by S2156 (1R)
2016-12-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2156 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.8.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback