NJ S2148 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A110
Note: Carry Foward to future S1756
Note: Carry Over of previous S566
Note: Carry Over of previous A1309
Note: Carry Over of previous S3331
Note: Carry Over of previous A4892
Note: Carry Foward to future S1756
Note: Carry Over of previous S566
Note: Carry Over of previous A1309
Note: Carry Over of previous S3331
Note: Carry Over of previous A4892
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises criteria to establish base year for homestead property tax reimbursement after relocation.
Title
Revises criteria to establish base year for homestead property tax reimbursement after relocation.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2148 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2148 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1327 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
S566 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1309 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3331 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4892 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Transferred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S2148 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1327 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
S566 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1309 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3331 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4892 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Transferred to Assembly Women and Children Committee