NJ S2122 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-7)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Approved P.L.2014, c.25.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-7)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Approved P.L.2014, c.25.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2015.
Title
Appropriates funds to DEP for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3264 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3264 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3264 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2014, c.25. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A3264 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3264 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S2122