NJ S2098 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts hydrogen fuel cell-powered vehicles from certain labeling requirements.
Title
Exempts hydrogen fuel cell-powered vehicles from certain labeling requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Rep. John Wisniewski [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3549 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2016, c.89. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0) |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A3549 |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3549 (Same As) 2016-11-21 - Substituted by S2098