NJ S2094 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2919
Note: Carry Foward to future S128
Note: Carry Over of previous S1906
Note: Carry Over of previous A3407
Note: Carry Foward to future S128
Note: Carry Over of previous S1906
Note: Carry Over of previous A3407
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires businesses to report email address to Division of Revenue and Enterprise Services.
Title
Requires businesses to report email address to Division of Revenue and Enterprise Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2094 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2094 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1077 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1906 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3407 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2094 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1077 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1906 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3407 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2094 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2500/2094_I1.HTM |