NJ S1906 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1077
Note: Carry Foward to future S2094
Note: Carry Over of previous S2490
Note: Carry Over of previous A2386
Note: Carry Foward to future S2094
Note: Carry Over of previous S2490
Note: Carry Over of previous A2386
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires businesses to report email address to Division of Revenue and Enterprise Services.
Title
Requires businesses to report email address to Division of Revenue and Enterprise Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1906 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1906 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3407 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2490 (Carry Over) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2386 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1906 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3407 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2490 (Carry Over) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2386 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1906 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1906_I1.HTM |