NJ A1077 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2919
Note: Carry Foward to future S128
Note: Carry Over of previous A3407
Note: Carry Over of previous S1906
Note: Carry Foward to future S128
Note: Carry Over of previous A3407
Note: Carry Over of previous S1906
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires businesses to report email address to Division of Revenue and Enterprise Services.
Title
Requires businesses to report email address to Division of Revenue and Enterprise Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1077 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A1077 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A3407 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1906 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2094 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1077 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A3407 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1906 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2094 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1077 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1500/1077_I1.HTM |