NJ S2021 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Approved P.L.2020, c.97.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $32,711,205,000 in State funds and $13,856,161,239 in federal funds for the State budget for fiscal year 2020-2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $32,711,205,000 in State funds and $13,856,161,239 in federal funds for the State budget for fiscal year 2020-2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4720 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29AssemblyApproved P.L.2020, c.97.
2020-09-24AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-27-1)
2020-09-24AssemblySubstituted for A4720
2020-09-24AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-09-24SenatePassed by the Senate (25-14)
2020-09-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-09-21SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4720 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2021

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback