NJ A4720 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $32,711,205,000 in State funds and $13,856,161,239 in federal funds for the State budget for fiscal year 2020-2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $32,711,205,000 in State funds and $13,856,161,239 in federal funds for the State budget for fiscal year 2020-2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24AssemblySubstituted by S2021
2020-09-21AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-09-21AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2021 (Same As) 2020-09-29 - Approved P.L.2020, c.97.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback