NJ S2004 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1833
Note: Carry Over of previous A5469
Note: Carry Over of previous S3329
Note: Carry Over of previous A5469
Note: Carry Over of previous S3329
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notice of motor vehicle safety recalls upon inspection and registration of motor vehicle; requires motor vehicle manufacturers to pay annual fee to MVC.
Title
Requires notice of motor vehicle safety recalls upon inspection and registration of motor vehicle; requires motor vehicle manufacturers to pay annual fee to MVC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2004 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2019 (Same As) 2023-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5469 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3329 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A2019 (Same As) 2023-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5469 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3329 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee