NJ S1897 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2895
Note: Carry Foward to future S1908
Note: Carry Over of previous S2255
Note: Carry Over of previous A114
Note: Carry Foward to future S1908
Note: Carry Over of previous S2255
Note: Carry Over of previous A114
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax credit and gross income tax credits for purchase and installation of certain electric vehicle charging stations.
Title
Provides corporation business tax credit and gross income tax credits for purchase and installation of certain electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1897 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1897 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A233 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2255 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A114 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1897 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A233 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2255 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A114 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1897 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1897_I1.HTM |