NJ S1851 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates eligibility of postsecondary students and other individuals for State student assistance, training, and employment services if school or training provider requires student to consent to arbitration agreement or proceeding or to waive certain rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminates eligibility of postsecondary students and other individuals for State student assistance, training, and employment services if school or training provider requires student to consent to arbitration agreement or proceeding or to waive certain rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4407 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19AssemblyApproved P.L.2021, c.53.
2021-03-01AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-4-1)
2021-03-01AssemblySubstituted for A4407 (1R)
2021-01-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2021-01-28SenatePassed by the Senate (28-1)
2021-01-11SenateSenate Amendment (22-0) (Ruiz)
2020-08-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4407 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S1851 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback