NJ A4407 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S1851 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates eligibility of postsecondary students and other individuals for State student assistance, training, and employment services if school or training provider requires student to consent to arbitration agreement or proceeding or to waive certain rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminates eligibility of postsecondary students and other individuals for State student assistance, training, and employment services if school or training provider requires student to consent to arbitration agreement or proceeding or to waive certain rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01AssemblySubstituted by S1851 (1R)
2020-10-08AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-07-16AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1851 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, c.53.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback