NJ S1761 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4907
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.175.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.175.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Address Confidentiality Program to include victims of sexual assault and stalking; and reproductive health service patients and providers.*
Title
Expands the Address Confidentiality Program to include victims of sexual assault and stalking; and reproductive health service patients and providers.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1651 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1651 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.175. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (47-24-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Howarth) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A1651/1861 (ACS) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1861 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Combined with A1651 (ACS)
A4907 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1651 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1761 (1R)
A4907 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1651 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1761 (1R)