NJ S171 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2153

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-11-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes grant program for homeless veterans shelters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes grant program for homeless veterans shelters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
2020-11-16SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-11-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-10-19SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-10-19SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2153 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A5076 (Same As) 2020-12-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback