NJ S169 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1645
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.181.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.181.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain emergency squad volunteers holding municipal elective office to vote on emergency squad concerns.
Title
Allows certain emergency squad volunteers holding municipal elective office to vote on emergency squad concerns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4329 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.181. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A4329 |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1645 (Carry Over) 2014-03-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4329 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S169
A4329 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S169