NJ S1651 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A359 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A359 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "Foreclosure Rescue Fraud Prevention Act."
Title
The "Foreclosure Rescue Fraud Prevention Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Substituted by A359 (2R) | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A359 (Same As) 2011-12-20 - Approved P.L.2011, c146.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S1651 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2000/1651_I1.HTM |