NJ S1647 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3246

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits use of coupons, price rebates, and price reduction promotions in sales of tobacco and vapor products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits use of coupons, price rebates, and price reduction promotions in sales of tobacco and vapor products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3181 (Same As) 2019-06-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3246 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback