NJ S1640 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.189.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes requirements concerning necessary care of dogs, domestic companion animals, and service animals, and for tethering of dogs.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes requirements concerning necessary care of dogs, domestic companion animals, and service animals, and for tethering of dogs.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3152 As (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.189.
2017-06-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2017-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-06-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-1-6)
2017-06-29AssemblySubstituted for A3152/3154/2426 (AS/2R)
2017-06-08AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jones)
2017-05-22AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Tucker)
2017-03-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-03-13SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2017-02-13SenateSenate Amendment (30-0) (Van Drew)
2017-01-30SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-12-12SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-12-12SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07SenateTransferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2016-02-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2968 (Carry Over) 2015-06-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A3152 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S1640/1642/1013 (SCS/4R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback