NJ A3152 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S1640/1642/1013 (SCS/4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes requirements concerning necessary care of dogs, domestic companion animals, and service animals, and for tethering of dogs.***

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes requirements concerning necessary care of dogs, domestic companion animals, and service animals, and for tethering of dogs.***

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29AssemblySubstituted by S1640/1642/1013 (SCS/4R)
2017-06-08AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jones)
2017-05-22AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Tucker)
2017-03-16AssemblyAssembly Substitution (Andrzejczak)
2016-09-15AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Andrzejczak)
2016-06-30AssemblyAssembly Substitution (Andrzejczak)
2016-06-16AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2016-06-06AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-02-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1640 (Same As) 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.189.
S2968 (Carry Over) 2015-06-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback