NJ S1612 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2468
Note: Carry Foward to future S2712
Note: Carry Foward to future A4652
Note: Carry Foward to future A530
Note: Carry Over of previous A840
Note: Carry Foward to future S2712
Note: Carry Foward to future A4652
Note: Carry Foward to future A530
Note: Carry Over of previous A840
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum certified nurse aide-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.
Title
Establishes minimum certified nurse aide-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Motion To Table (21-15) (Weinberg) |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Singer) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A382 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A840 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A382 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A840 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee