NJ A530 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A382
Note: Carry Over of previous S1612
Note: Carry Over of previous S1612
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum certified nurse aide-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.
Title
Establishes minimum certified nurse aide-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A382 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2468 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2712 (Same As) 2020-10-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.112.
S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2468 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2712 (Same As) 2020-10-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.112.
S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A530 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/530_I1.HTM |