NJ A4652 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1612
Note: Carry Over of previous A382
Note: Carry Over of previous A382
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2712 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2712 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum direct care staff-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.
Title
Establishes minimum direct care staff-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2712 (2R) |
2020-09-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-21 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2020-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2712 (Same As) 2020-10-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.112.
S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A382 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1612 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A382 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee