NJ S1589 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain standards for professional and occupational boards considering applicants with criminal history records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain standards for professional and occupational boards considering applicants with criminal history records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3872 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback