NJ S1523 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1050
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Victims of Crime Compensation Office to make payment for relocation expenses of certain witnesses of crimes.
Title
Authorizes Victims of Crime Compensation Office to make payment for relocation expenses of certain witnesses of crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1523 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4715 (Same As) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4715 (Same As) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee