NJ S1482 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4124
Note: Carry Over of previous A5439
Note: Carry Over of previous A5439
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A744 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A744 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to provide internal affairs and personnel files of law enforcement officers to other agencies under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires law enforcement agencies to provide internal affairs and personnel files of law enforcement officers to other agencies under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A744 (2R) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A744 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.52.
S4124 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5439 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S4124 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5439 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee