NJ S1435 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2127
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.241.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.241.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes marketing and advertising campaign for State wineries and viticulture attractions.*
Title
Establishes marketing and advertising campaign for State wineries and viticulture attractions.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3643 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3643 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-15 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.241. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A3643 (2R) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Transferred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2127 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A3047
A3643 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1435 (2R)
A3643 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1435 (2R)