NJ S1427 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1420
Note: Carry Over of previous A4494
Note: Carry Over of previous A4494
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to persons leasing agricultural land to beginning farmers.
Title
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to persons leasing agricultural land to beginning farmers.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1427 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A808 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A4494 (Carry Over) 2017-01-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A808 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A4494 (Carry Over) 2017-01-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee