NJ S1398 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2377
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.48.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.48.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expands infertility coverage under certain health insurance plans.
Title
Expands infertility coverage under certain health insurance plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1447 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1447 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.48. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-1) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (58-6-3) |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted for A1447 (2R) |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1447 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S1398 (2R)
A2377 (Carry Over) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A2377 (Carry Over) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee