NJ A1447 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2377
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S1398 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S1398 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands infertility coverage under certain health insurance plans.
Title
Expands infertility coverage under certain health insurance plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted by S1398 (2R) |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2377 (Carry Over) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1398 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.48.
S1398 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.48.