NJ S1359 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.187.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Guarantees full and equal access to all housing to disabled persons who retain their retired service or guide dog as a pet, and who also obtain a new service or guide dog.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guarantees full and equal access to all housing to disabled persons who retain their retired service or guide dog as a pet, and who also obtain a new service or guide dog.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4096 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.187.
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2017-06-22AssemblySubstituted for A4096
2016-10-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-09-08AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
2016-08-01SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2016-06-16SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2838 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A4096 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S1359

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback