NJ S1315 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.121.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revises statutes regarding practice of physical therapy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises statutes regarding practice of physical therapy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1839 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.121.
2017-06-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2017-06-22SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-0-4)
2017-06-22AssemblySubstituted for A1839 (2R)
2017-06-08AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jones)
2017-06-01AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2017-02-27SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S874 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1839 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S1315 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback