NJ S1314 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1491
Note: Carry Over of previous S3142
Note: Carry Over of previous A1418
Note: Carry Over of previous S3142
Note: Carry Over of previous A1418
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires lobby security for certain senior citizen high-rise buildings in areas with high violent crime rates.
Title
Requires lobby security for certain senior citizen high-rise buildings in areas with high violent crime rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1314 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1730 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S3142 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1418 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1730 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S3142 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1418 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1314 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1314_I1.HTM |