NJ A1418 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1730
Note: Carry Foward to future S1314
Note: Carry Over of previous A3431
Note: Carry Foward to future S1314
Note: Carry Over of previous A3431
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires lobby security for certain senior citizen high-rise buildings in areas with high violent crime rates.
Title
Requires lobby security for certain senior citizen high-rise buildings in areas with high violent crime rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1418 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1418 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3431 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3142 (Same As) 2018-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1418 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3431 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3142 (Same As) 2018-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee