NJ S1312 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A2164 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A2164 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Healthy Small Food Retailer Act".**
Title
"Healthy Small Food Retailer Act".**
Sponsors
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Senate | Substituted by A2164 (ACS/1R) |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2164 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.15.