NJ S1261 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts sale or lease of certain ultrasound equipment.
Title
Restricts sale or lease of certain ultrasound equipment.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Withdrawn from Consideration | |
2010-02-18 | Transferred to Senate Commerce Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1129 (Same As) 2010-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S1261 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S1500/1261_I1.HTM |