NJ S1242 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2631
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.279.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.279.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boil water notices to be provided to municipal officials within one hour. *
Title
Requires boil water notices to be provided to municipal officials within one hour. *
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2423 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.279. |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A2423 (1R) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2631 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A2423 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S1242 (1R)
A2423 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S1242 (1R)