NJ A2423 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2631
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S1242 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S1242 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boil water notices to be provided to municipal clerk within one hour. *
Title
Requires boil water notices to be provided to municipal clerk within one hour. *
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S1242 (1R) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1242 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.279.
A2631 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A2631 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee