NJ S1228 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A1944 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Automatically registers or updates voter registration as part of driver's license application or renewal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatically registers or updates voter registration as part of driver's license application or renewal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-27SenateSubstituted by A1944 (2R)
2016-06-23SenateSenate Amendment (23-3) (Vitale)
2016-06-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1944 (Same As) 2016-09-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
A3432 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback