NJ A1944 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2016 - 75% progression
Action: 2016-09-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Automatically registers or updates voter registration as part of driver's license application or renewal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatically registers or updates voter registration as part of driver's license application or renewal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1228 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-08SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2016-06-27AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-25-0)
2016-06-27AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2016-06-27SenatePassed by the Senate (22-16)
2016-06-27SenateSubstituted for S1228 (2R)
2016-06-23SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Vitale)
2016-06-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-06-06SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2016-05-26AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (52-21-1)
2016-05-26AssemblyMotion To Table (49-25-0) (Greenwald)
2016-05-26AssemblyMotion To Aa (Carroll)
2016-05-23AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3432 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1228 (Same As) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A1944 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback