NJ A3432 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S1825
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes task force to study and make recommendations concerning mobility and support services needs of NJ adults with autism spectrum disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes task force to study and make recommendations concerning mobility and support services needs of NJ adults with autism spectrum disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15AssemblySubstituted by S1825
2016-10-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1825 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.53.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback