NJ S481 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1228
Note: Carryover of previous S1228

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A2014 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Automatically registers to vote and updates voter registration for eligible person when applying for motor vehicle driver's license, examination permit, probationary driver's license, or non-driver identification card.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatically registers to vote and updates voter registration for eligible person when applying for motor vehicle driver's license, examination permit, probationary driver's license, or non-driver identification card.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateSubstituted by A2014 (ACS)
2018-04-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-26SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-03-26SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1228 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A1944 (2R)
S1228 (Carry Over) 2014-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2014 (Same As) 2018-04-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.6.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback