NJ S1218 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S587
Note: Carry Foward to future A2763
Note: Carry Over of previous A3591
Note: Carry Foward to future A2763
Note: Carry Over of previous A3591
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Voter Empowerment Act"; permits 17 year olds to vote in primary election if they turn 18 years old before next succeeding general election.
Title
"New Voter Empowerment Act"; permits 17 year olds to vote in primary election if they turn 18 years old before next succeeding general election.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1218 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1218 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1521 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A3591 (Carry Over) 2016-09-08 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1218 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1521 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A3591 (Carry Over) 2016-09-08 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly