NJ A1521 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2763
Note: Carry Foward to future S587
Note: Carry Over of previous A3591
Note: Carry Foward to future S587
Note: Carry Over of previous A3591
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Voter Empowerment Act"; permits 17 year olds to vote in primary election if they turn 18 years old before next succeeding general election.
Title
"New Voter Empowerment Act"; permits 17 year olds to vote in primary election if they turn 18 years old before next succeeding general election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (56-17-0) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1521 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A1521 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A3591 (Carry Over) 2016-09-08 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1218 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1521 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A3591 (Carry Over) 2016-09-08 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1218 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading