NJ S1214 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2373
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.159.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.159.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipal land banking in conjunction with online property database development.
Title
Permits municipal land banking in conjunction with online property database development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3797 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3797 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.159. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-12) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (52-24-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A3797 (2R) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-10) |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2373 (Carry Over) 2016-06-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3797 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1214 (2R)
A3797 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1214 (2R)