NJ A3797 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2373

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1214 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits municipal land banking in conjunction with online property database development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits municipal land banking in conjunction with online property database development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted by S1214 (2R)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-20AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-31AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-09-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1214 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-12)
S2373 (Carry Over) 2016-06-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback