NJ S1153 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2470
Note: Carry Foward to future A4074
Note: Carry Over of previous S2544
Note: Carry Over of previous A4784
Note: Carry Foward to future A4074
Note: Carry Over of previous S2544
Note: Carry Over of previous A4784
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits students at public institutions of higher education to donate unused meal plan funds to emergency meal fund for distribution to New Jersey food banks.
Title
Permits students at public institutions of higher education to donate unused meal plan funds to emergency meal fund for distribution to New Jersey food banks.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1153 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S1153 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1377 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2544 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - Transferred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4784 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1153 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1377 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2544 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - Transferred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4784 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1153 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1153_I1.HTM |