NJ S1152 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved P.L.2015, c.38.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved P.L.2015, c.38.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits attending advanced practice nurse to determine cause of death and execute death certification of patient if nurse is patient's primary caregiver.
Title
Permits attending advanced practice nurse to determine cause of death and execute death certification of patient if nurse is patient's primary caregiver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1319 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1319 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported without Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1319 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1319 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported without Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.38. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-5-1) |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Substituted for A1319 (1R) |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading w/o recommendation |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1319 (Same As) 2015-03-09 - Substituted by S1152 (1R)